Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Signatures

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0370 (SB0354)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0432 (SB0366)
Title
Public Health - Rabies Vaccination Information - Submission to Local Agencies and Use for Licensing
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0446 /CH0178 (SB0909/CH0177)
Title
Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety Officials
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0897 (SB0684)
Title
Liquor Board Reform Act of 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0994 (SB1077)
Title
Statute of Limitations - Residential Leases Signed Under Seal
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1505
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Clarification of Referendum Process - Veto Override
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1632 /CH0011 (SB1174)
Title
Public Health - Certificates of Birth - Births Outside an Institution
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0193
Title
Physicians - Professional Liability Insurance Coverage - Notification and Posting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0354 (HB0370)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0366 (HB0432)
Title
Public Health - Rabies Vaccination Information - Submission to Local Agencies and Use for Licensing
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0684 (HB0897)
Title
Liquor Board Reform Act of 2017
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0909 /CH0177 (HB0446/CH0178)
Title
Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety Officials
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0994
Title
School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1077 (HB0994)
Title
Statute of Limitations - Residential Leases Signed Under Seal
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1086
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency and Registered Voter Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1174 (HB1632/CH0011)
Title
Public Health - Certificates of Birth - Births Outside an Institution
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0370 (SB0354) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0432 (SB0366) Public Health - Rabies Vaccination Information - Submission to Local Agencies and Use for Licensing Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0446 /CH0178 (SB0909/CH0177) Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety Officials Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0897 (SB0684) Liquor Board Reform Act of 2017 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0994 (SB1077) Statute of Limitations - Residential Leases Signed Under Seal Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1505 Constitutional Amendment - Clarification of Referendum Process - Veto Override Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1632 /CH0011 (SB1174) Public Health - Certificates of Birth - Births Outside an Institution Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 11
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0193 Physicians - Professional Liability Insurance Coverage - Notification and Posting Requirements Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/01/2017 - 2:00 PM
SB0354 (HB0370) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0366 (HB0432) Public Health - Rabies Vaccination Information - Submission to Local Agencies and Use for Licensing Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0684 (HB0897) Liquor Board Reform Act of 2017 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0909 /CH0177 (HB0446/CH0178) Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety Officials Charles County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177
Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0994 School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2017 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1077 (HB0994) Statute of Limitations - Residential Leases Signed Under Seal Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1086 Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency and Registered Voter Requirements Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (128-3)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1174 (HB1632/CH0011) Public Health - Certificates of Birth - Births Outside an Institution Senator Jennings 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM