Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Signatures

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0027 /CH0430 (SB0168/CH0431)
Title
Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Underwriting Standards and Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0194 /CH0049
Title
State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Requirement to Register - Exemptions
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0201 /CH0047 (SB0106/CH0048)
Title
State Board for Professional Engineers - Examination Requirements - Engineer-in-Training
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0370 /CH0353 (SB0279/CH0354)
Title
Metro Board Member Act
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0863 /CH0483 (SB0698)
Title
State Board of Nursing - Advanced Practice Registered Nurses - Certification and Practice
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0899 (SB0114)
Title
Harford County - Board of License Commissioners - Temporary License Application
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1205 (SB0722)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Alcohol- or Drug-Related Driving Offenses - Testing Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1257 /CH0787
Title
Residential Leases - Lease Option Agreements - Required Statements
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1299
Title
Nursing Facilities - Discharge Plans - Review and Signature Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1323
Title
Consumer Protection - Cellular Telephones - Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1579 (SB0922)
Title
Alcohol and Drug Abuse Program Facilities - ASAM Criteria Assessments
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1647
Title
Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0106 /CH0048 (HB0201/CH0047)
Title
State Board for Professional Engineers - Examination Requirements - Engineer-in-Training
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0114 (HB0899)
Title
Harford County - Board of License Commissioners - Temporary License Application
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0168 /CH0431 (HB0027/CH0430)
Title
Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Underwriting Standards and Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0279 /CH0354 (HB0370/CH0353)
Title
Metro Board Member Act
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0474 /CH0457
Title
Ethics - Local Public Ethics Commissions and Entities - Meeting and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0547
Title
Election Law - Elections by Mail
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0722 (HB1205)
Title
Motor Vehicles – Alcohol– or Drug–Related Driving Offenses – Testing Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0922 (HB1579)
Title
Alcohol and Drug Abuse Program Facilities - ASAM Criteria Assessments
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1195
Title
Maryland Uniform Real Property Electronic Recording Act
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0027 /CH0430 (SB0168/CH0431) Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Underwriting Standards and Procedures Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Health and Government Operations
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0194 /CH0049 State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Requirement to Register - Exemptions Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Economic Matters
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0201 /CH0047 (SB0106/CH0048) State Board for Professional Engineers - Examination Requirements - Engineer-in-Training Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 47
Economic Matters
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0370 /CH0353 (SB0279/CH0354) Metro Board Member Act Delegate Korman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0863 /CH0483 (SB0698) State Board of Nursing - Advanced Practice Registered Nurses - Certification and Practice Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 483
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0899 (SB0114) Harford County - Board of License Commissioners - Temporary License Application Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1205 (SB0722) Motor Vehicles - Alcohol- or Drug-Related Driving Offenses - Testing Requirement Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1257 /CH0787 Residential Leases - Lease Option Agreements - Required Statements Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 787
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1299 Nursing Facilities - Discharge Plans - Review and Signature Requirement Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1323 Consumer Protection - Cellular Telephones - Disclosure Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1579 (SB0922) Alcohol and Drug Abuse Program Facilities - ASAM Criteria Assessments Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1647 Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service Agreements Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0106 /CH0048 (HB0201/CH0047) State Board for Professional Engineers - Examination Requirements - Engineer-in-Training Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 48
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/11/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0114 (HB0899) Harford County - Board of License Commissioners - Temporary License Application Senator Norman 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0168 /CH0431 (HB0027/CH0430) Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Underwriting Standards and Procedures Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Finance
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0279 /CH0354 (HB0370/CH0353) Metro Board Member Act Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
Finance
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0474 /CH0457 Ethics - Local Public Ethics Commissions and Entities - Meeting and Reporting Requirements Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0547 Election Law - Elections by Mail Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0722 (HB1205) Motor Vehicles – Alcohol– or Drug–Related Driving Offenses – Testing Requirement Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0922 (HB1579) Alcohol and Drug Abuse Program Facilities - ASAM Criteria Assessments Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1195 Maryland Uniform Real Property Electronic Recording Act Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:55 PM