Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Signs and Billboards

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0839
Title
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0880
Title
Public Safety - Demolition Work - Safety Provisions and Permitting
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0883
Title
Public Schools - Synthetic Turf Fields - Informational Signs
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0961 (SB0955)
Title
Federal-Aid Primary Highways - Signs
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1002 (SB0906)
Title
Weapon-Free Higher Education Zones
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1024 /CH0731
Title
Montgomery County - Municipal Authority to Regulate Structures - Clarification PG/MC 112-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1027
Title
Prince George's County - Land Use Permit Review - Consolidation PG/MC 110-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1472
Title
Fire Safety Construction Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1598 (SB1120)
Title
Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing Plaque
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0405
Title
State Highway Administration - Service Signs - Business or Attraction Located in Shopping Center
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0616
Title
State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Naming Rights for Rest Areas and Welcome Centers
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0617
Title
Transportation - State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Highway Naming Rights
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0955 (HB0961)
Title
Federal-Aid Primary Highways - Signs
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1120 (HB1598)
Title
Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing Plaque
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0839 Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces Delegate Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0880 Public Safety - Demolition Work - Safety Provisions and Permitting Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0883 Public Schools - Synthetic Turf Fields - Informational Signs Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0961 (SB0955) Federal-Aid Primary Highways - Signs Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1002 (SB0906) Weapon-Free Higher Education Zones Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Appropriations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1024 /CH0731 Montgomery County - Municipal Authority to Regulate Structures - Clarification PG/MC 112-16 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 731
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1027 Prince George's County - Land Use Permit Review - Consolidation PG/MC 110-16 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1472 Fire Safety Construction Act of 2016 Delegate Branch 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1598 (SB1120) Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing Plaque Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0405 State Highway Administration - Service Signs - Business or Attraction Located in Shopping Center Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0616 State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Naming Rights for Rest Areas and Welcome Centers Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0617 Transportation - State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Highway Naming Rights Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0955 (HB0961) Federal-Aid Primary Highways - Signs Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB1120 (HB1598) Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing Plaque Senator Reilly 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM