Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Signs and Billboards

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0013
Title
Baltimore City - High Crime Zones - Required Public Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0036 (SB0302)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0159
Title
Weapon-Free Higher Education Zones
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0168
Title
Election Law - Required Notifications - Voter Challenges or Intimidation
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0184 /CH0768
Title
Public Health - Treatment of Attention-Deficit/Hyperactivity Disorder - Identification and Posting of Information
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534 /CH0136 (SB0098)
Title
Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing Plaque
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0594
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Candidate Signs and Proposition Signs
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0600 (SB0175)
Title
Public Health - Use of Medical Oxygen in Residential Dwellings - Smoking and Open Flame Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0619 /CH0285 (SB0882/CH0284)
Title
Election Law - Campaign Signs at Polling Places
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0862
Title
Baltimore County - Elementary Schools - Speed Bumps
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0947
Title
Vehicle Laws - Vehicle Presence Monitoring Systems - Authorization by Local Jurisdictions
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0968
Title
Children - Health and Safety - Child Abuse and Neglect Hotline and Signage
Sponsor
Delegate Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1133
Title
Washington County - State Highway Rights-of-Way - Tree Planting and Signs
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1311 (SB0722)
Title
Public Safety - Light Frame Combustible Construction - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0098 (HB0534/CH0136)
Title
Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing Plaque
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0175 (HB0600)
Title
Public Health - Use of Medical Oxygen in Residential Dwellings - Smoking and Open Flame Restrictions
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0193
Title
Physicians - Professional Liability Insurance Coverage - Notification and Posting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0302 (HB0036)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0430
Title
State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Naming Rights for Rest Areas and Welcome Centers
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0431
Title
Transportation - State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Highway Naming Rights
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0722 (HB1311)
Title
Public Safety - Light Frame Combustible Construction - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0882 /CH0284 (HB0619/CH0285)
Title
Election Law - Campaign Signs at Polling Places
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0013 Baltimore City - High Crime Zones - Required Public Notice Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0036 (SB0302) Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2017 - 2:00 PM
HB0159 Weapon-Free Higher Education Zones Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Appropriations
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0168 Election Law - Required Notifications - Voter Challenges or Intimidation Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/07/2017 - 1:30 PM
HB0184 /CH0768 Public Health - Treatment of Attention-Deficit/Hyperactivity Disorder - Identification and Posting of Information Delegate Morales 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 768
Health and Government Operations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0534 /CH0136 (SB0098) Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing Plaque Delegate Parrott 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0594 Landlord and Tenant - Candidate Signs and Proposition Signs Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0600 (SB0175) Public Health - Use of Medical Oxygen in Residential Dwellings - Smoking and Open Flame Restrictions Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0619 /CH0285 (SB0882/CH0284) Election Law - Campaign Signs at Polling Places Delegate Hornberger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 285
Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0862 Baltimore County - Elementary Schools - Speed Bumps Delegate West 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0947 Vehicle Laws - Vehicle Presence Monitoring Systems - Authorization by Local Jurisdictions Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0968 Children - Health and Safety - Child Abuse and Neglect Hotline and Signage Delegate Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1133 Washington County - State Highway Rights-of-Way - Tree Planting and Signs Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1311 (SB0722) Public Safety - Light Frame Combustible Construction - Requirements Delegate McCray 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0098 (HB0534/CH0136) Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing Plaque Senator Reilly 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Finance
1/25/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0175 (HB0600) Public Health - Use of Medical Oxygen in Residential Dwellings - Smoking and Open Flame Restrictions Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0193 Physicians - Professional Liability Insurance Coverage - Notification and Posting Requirements Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/01/2017 - 2:00 PM
SB0302 (HB0036) Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0430 State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Naming Rights for Rest Areas and Welcome Centers Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0431 Transportation - State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Highway Naming Rights Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0722 (HB1311) Public Safety - Light Frame Combustible Construction - Requirements Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0882 /CH0284 (HB0619/CH0285) Election Law - Campaign Signs at Polling Places Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM