Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Smart Growth -see also- Zoning and Planning

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0409 /CH0521 (SB0443)
Title
Land Use - Comprehensive Planning and Zoning Cycle
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0613 /CH0624
Title
Sustainable Communities - Designation and Financing
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0949 (SB0936)
Title
SmartStat Technical Assistance and Support Center
Sponsor
Delegate Bobo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1170 /CH0593 (SB0965/CH0592)
Title
Maryland Smart Growth Investment Fund Workgroup
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1257 /CH0674
Title
Land Use - Clarifications and Corrections
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385
Title
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Deadline Extension
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0671 /CH0520
Title
Land Use - Local Comprehensive Planning and Zoning Cycle
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0936 (HB0949)
Title
SmartStat Technical Assistance and Support Center
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0965 /CH0592 (HB1170/CH0593)
Title
Maryland Smart Growth Investment Fund Workgroup
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0409 /CH0521 (SB0443) Land Use - Comprehensive Planning and Zoning Cycle Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 521
Environmental Matters
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0613 /CH0624 Sustainable Communities - Designation and Financing Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 624
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
4/02/2013 - 1:30 PM
HB0949 (SB0936) SmartStat Technical Assistance and Support Center Delegate Bobo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB1170 /CH0593 (SB0965/CH0592) Maryland Smart Growth Investment Fund Workgroup Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 593
Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1257 /CH0674 Land Use - Clarifications and Corrections Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 674
Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1385 Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Deadline Extension Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0671 /CH0520 Land Use - Local Comprehensive Planning and Zoning Cycle Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 520
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0936 (HB0949) SmartStat Technical Assistance and Support Center Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0965 /CH0592 (HB1170/CH0593) Maryland Smart Growth Investment Fund Workgroup Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 592
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM