Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Smart Growth -see also- Zoning and Planning

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1402 (SB1011/CH0387)
Title
Prince George's County - Public School Construction - Prince George's County Alternative Financing Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0003 (HB0117)
Title
Maryland Smart Growth Investment Fund – Supplementary Appropriation
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0581 /CH0211 (HB1260)
Title
Economic, Housing, and Community Development – Opportunity Zone Incentives
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1011 /CH0387 (HB1402)
Title
Prince George’s County – Public School Construction – Prince George’s County Public–Private Partnership Fund
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1402 (SB1011/CH0387) Prince George's County - Public School Construction - Prince George's County Alternative Financing Fund Delegate Jackson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0003 (HB0117) Maryland Smart Growth Investment Fund – Supplementary Appropriation Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Finance
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0581 /CH0211 (HB1260) Economic, Housing, and Community Development – Opportunity Zone Incentives Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2019 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1011 /CH0387 (HB1402) Prince George’s County – Public School Construction – Prince George’s County Public–Private Partnership Fund Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 387
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM