Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Smoking -see also- Cigarettes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0185 (SB0843)
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Health Improvement and Cost Savings Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0528 (SB0030)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Prohibition Against Smoking in Vehicle Containing Young Child
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0676
Title
Montgomery County - Nuisances in Multidwelling Buildings - Private Right of Action MC 10-13
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0683 (SB0700)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0684
Title
Tobacco-Free Schools Act
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0759
Title
Vehicle Laws - Distracted Driving - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0948 (SB0708)
Title
Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1351
Title
Health - Smoking - Public Playgrounds and Swimming Pools - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1413 /CH0595 (SB0969/CH0594)
Title
Public Safety - Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Smoke Alarms
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1453
Title
Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and Taxation
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0030 (HB0528)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Prohibition Against Smoking in Vehicle Containing Young Child
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0700 (HB0683)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708 (HB0948)
Title
Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0843 (HB0185)
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Health Improvement and Cost Savings Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0969 /CH0594 (HB1413/CH0595)
Title
Public Safety - Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Smoke Alarms
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0185 (SB0843) State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Health Improvement and Cost Savings Act of 2013 Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0528 (SB0030) Vehicle Laws - Prohibition Against Smoking in Vehicle Containing Young Child Delegate Barnes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:15 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 PM
HB0676 Montgomery County - Nuisances in Multidwelling Buildings - Private Right of Action MC 10-13 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0683 (SB0700) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0684 Tobacco-Free Schools Act Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0759 Vehicle Laws - Distracted Driving - Prohibition Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0948 (SB0708) Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1351 Health - Smoking - Public Playgrounds and Swimming Pools - Prohibition Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1413 /CH0595 (SB0969/CH0594) Public Safety - Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Smoke Alarms Delegate Malone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 595
Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1453 Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and Taxation Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0030 (HB0528) Vehicle Laws - Prohibition Against Smoking in Vehicle Containing Young Child Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0700 (HB0683) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Senator Jones-Rodwell 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2013 - 1:15 PM
Finance
SB0708 (HB0948) Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Finance
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Health and Government Operations
SB0843 (HB0185) State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Health Improvement and Cost Savings Act of 2013 Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0969 /CH0594 (HB1413/CH0595) Public Safety - Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Smoke Alarms Senator Glassman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 594
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM