Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Smoking -see also- Cigarettes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0443 (SB0589)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0585 (SB0082)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Prohibition Against Smoking in Vehicle Containing Young Child
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0664
Title
Rental Units, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Smoking Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0880 (SB0658)
Title
Marijuana Control Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1070
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Cigarette Restitution Fund - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1291
Title
Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Smoking Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1334
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Regulations to Prohibit Smoking PG/MC 112-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1335
Title
Health - Smoking - Public Playgrounds and Swimming Pools - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1408
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Smoke-Free or Tobacco-Free Campuses - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Wood
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0082 (HB0585)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Prohibition Against Smoking in Vehicle Containing Young Child
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0288
Title
Public Schools - Smoking on the Grounds of School Property - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0589 (HB0443)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0658 (HB0880)
Title
The Marijuana Taxation and Regulation Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0735
Title
Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0443 (SB0589) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0585 (SB0082) Vehicle Laws - Prohibition Against Smoking in Vehicle Containing Young Child Delegate Barnes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0664 Rental Units, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Smoking Restrictions Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0880 (SB0658) Marijuana Control Act of 2014 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1070 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Cigarette Restitution Fund - Report Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1291 Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Smoking Devices - Prohibition Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1334 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Regulations to Prohibit Smoking PG/MC 112-14 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1335 Health - Smoking - Public Playgrounds and Swimming Pools - Prohibition Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1408 Public Institutions of Higher Education - Smoke-Free or Tobacco-Free Campuses - Funding Delegate Wood 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0082 (HB0585) Vehicle Laws - Prohibition Against Smoking in Vehicle Containing Young Child Senator Forehand 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
SB0288 Public Schools - Smoking on the Grounds of School Property - Prohibition Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0589 (HB0443) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Senator Jones-Rodwell 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 PM
Finance
SB0658 (HB0880) The Marijuana Taxation and Regulation Act Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0735 Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM