Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Smoking -see also- Cigarettes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0026
Title
Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Smoking Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0105
Title
Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia and Marijuana - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0108 (SB0037)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0357
Title
Vehicle Laws - Prohibition Against Smoking in Vehicle Containing Young Child
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0478
Title
Labor and Employment - Discrimination Based on the Use of Tobacco Products - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0489 /CH0425 (SB0007)
Title
Electronic Cigarettes - Sale to Minors - Components, Supplies, and Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0585 /CH0438
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Regulations to Prohibit Smoking MC/PG 109-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911 (SB0531)
Title
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1015
Title
Public Health - Responsible Tobacco Retailing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0007 (HB0489/CH0425)
Title
Electronic Cigarettes - Sale to Minors - Components, Supplies, and Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0037 (HB0108)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0517
Title
Criminal Law - Use and Possession of Marijuana and Drug Paraphernalia
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0531 (HB0911)
Title
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0026 Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Smoking Devices - Prohibition Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0105 Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia and Marijuana - Penalties Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-3)
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0108 (SB0037) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0357 Vehicle Laws - Prohibition Against Smoking in Vehicle Containing Young Child Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0478 Labor and Employment - Discrimination Based on the Use of Tobacco Products - Prohibition Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0489 /CH0425 (SB0007) Electronic Cigarettes - Sale to Minors - Components, Supplies, and Enforcement Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Finance
HB0585 /CH0438 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Regulations to Prohibit Smoking MC/PG 109-15 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 438
Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0911 (SB0531) Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1015 Public Health - Responsible Tobacco Retailing Act of 2015 Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0007 (HB0489/CH0425) Electronic Cigarettes - Sale to Minors - Components, Supplies, and Enforcement Senator Middleton 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
1/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Judiciary
SB0037 (HB0108) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Finance
SB0517 Criminal Law - Use and Possession of Marijuana and Drug Paraphernalia Senator Zirkin 2 2 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 4 of 2016
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0531 (HB0911) Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015 Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM