Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Smoking -see also- Cigarettes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0071 (SB0514)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0183
Title
Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0334
Title
Criminal Law - Marijuana Consumption in Public Place - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0750
Title
Public Schools - Electronic Smoking Devices - Policy and Disciplinary Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0809
Title
Marijuana - Smoking or Consuming in a Vehicle or Vessel - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0861
Title
Electronic Smoking Devices - Regulation and Taxation
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1069 /CH0293
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Entertainment Concessionaire and Facility Licenses PG 311-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1304 (SB1036)
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1312 (SB1005/CH0515)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1431
Title
Vehicle Laws - Prohibition Against Smoking in Vehicle Containing Young Child
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1504
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Distribution of Tobacco Products to Minors - Prohibition and Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1580
Title
Marijuana CONTRol (Cannabis Oversight and Nondiscrimination through Taxation, Regulation, and Legalization) Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0114
Title
Health - Prohibition on Distribution of Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices to Minors - Civil Enforcement
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0204
Title
Electronic Smoking Devices - E-Liquid Containers - Child-Resistant Packaging
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0514 (HB0071)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0891
Title
Criminal Law - Use and Possession of Marijuana
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1005 /CH0515 (HB1312)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1036 (HB1304)
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - Penalty
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0071 (SB0514) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0183 Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - Prohibition Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0334 Criminal Law - Marijuana Consumption in Public Place - Prohibition Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0750 Public Schools - Electronic Smoking Devices - Policy and Disciplinary Standards Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
Economic Matters
HB0777 Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0809 Marijuana - Smoking or Consuming in a Vehicle or Vessel - Prohibition Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0861 Electronic Smoking Devices - Regulation and Taxation Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1069 /CH0293 Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Entertainment Concessionaire and Facility Licenses PG 311-16 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 293
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1304 (SB1036) Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - Penalty Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1312 (SB1005/CH0515) Justice Reinvestment Act Speaker 6 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/04/2016 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
HB1431 Vehicle Laws - Prohibition Against Smoking in Vehicle Containing Young Child Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1504 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Distribution of Tobacco Products to Minors - Prohibition and Enforcement Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Economic Matters
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Rules
HB1580 Marijuana CONTRol (Cannabis Oversight and Nondiscrimination through Taxation, Regulation, and Legalization) Act of 2016 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0114 Health - Prohibition on Distribution of Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices to Minors - Civil Enforcement Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0204 Electronic Smoking Devices - E-Liquid Containers - Child-Resistant Packaging Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0514 (HB0071) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0891 Criminal Law - Use and Possession of Marijuana Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1005 /CH0515 (HB1312) Justice Reinvestment Act President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Health and Government Operations
SB1036 (HB1304) Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - Penalty Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM