Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Smoking -see also- Cannabis; Cigarettes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0185 /CH0773
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Distribution of Tobacco Products to Minors - Prohibition and Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0354 (SB0624)
Title
Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Cigarette Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0396 (SB0326)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Shop Licenses
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0500
Title
Rental Units, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Smoking Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0523 /CH0814 (SB0119)
Title
Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems and Vaping Liquid - Licensing
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0600 (SB0175)
Title
Public Health - Use of Medical Oxygen in Residential Dwellings - Smoking and Open Flame Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0703 (SB0113)
Title
Public Health - Tobacco Control Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1043
Title
Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0113 (HB0703)
Title
Public Health - Tobacco Control Funding
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0119 (HB0523/CH0814)
Title
Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems - Licensing
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0175 (HB0600)
Title
Public Health - Use of Medical Oxygen in Residential Dwellings - Smoking and Open Flame Restrictions
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0326 (HB0396)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Shop Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0445
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0624 (HB0354)
Title
Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Cigarette Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0185 /CH0773 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Distribution of Tobacco Products to Minors - Prohibition and Enforcement Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 773
Economic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0354 (SB0624) Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Cigarette Devices - Prohibition Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0396 (SB0326) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Shop Licenses Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0500 Rental Units, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Smoking Restrictions Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0523 /CH0814 (SB0119) Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems and Vaping Liquid - Licensing Delegate Jameson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 814
Economic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0600 (SB0175) Public Health - Use of Medical Oxygen in Residential Dwellings - Smoking and Open Flame Restrictions Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0703 (SB0113) Public Health - Tobacco Control Funding Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1043 Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - Prohibition Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0113 (HB0703) Public Health - Tobacco Control Funding Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/01/2017 - 2:00 PM
SB0119 (HB0523/CH0814) Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems - Licensing Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0175 (HB0600) Public Health - Use of Medical Oxygen in Residential Dwellings - Smoking and Open Flame Restrictions Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0326 (HB0396) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Shop Licenses Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0445 Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0624 (HB0354) Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Cigarette Devices - Prohibition Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM