Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Smoking -see also- Cannabis; Cigarettes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0606
Title
Public Health - Tobacco Control Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0651
Title
Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0127
Title
Criminal Law and Vehicle Laws – Marijuana – Criminal Threshold and Smoking in Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0254
Title
Public Health - Tobacco Control Funding
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0345
Title
Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0606 Public Health - Tobacco Control Funding Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0651 Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - Prohibition Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0127 Criminal Law and Vehicle Laws – Marijuana – Criminal Threshold and Smoking in Vehicles Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0254 Public Health - Tobacco Control Funding Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/31/2018 - 2:30 PM
SB0345 Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - Prohibition Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:55 PM