Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Smoking -see also- Cannabis; Cigarettes

Legislation
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0017 /CH0456 (SB0857)
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Processing and Dispensing Medical Cannabis
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0027
Title
Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Cigarette Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0656 (SB0771)
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1052 /CH0012 (SB0703)
Title
Alcohol and Tobacco Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1169 /CH0396 (SB0895)
Title
Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1174
Title
Medical Cannabis - Pesticide Use - Labeling and Study
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1185 (SB0708)
Title
Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems - Prohibitions and Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1217 (SB0497)
Title
Pharmacists - Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use - Prescribing and Dispensing
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1307
Title
Marijuana Laws - Full Disclosure of Legal, Employment, and Health Risks
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0378
Title
Tobacco Products and Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems - Minimum Age and Civil Fines
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708 (HB1185)
Title
Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems - Prohibitions and Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0749
Title
Medical Cannabis - Pesticide Use - Labeling and Study
Sponsor
Senator Lam
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0771 (HB0656)
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Smith
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0895 (HB1169/CH0396)
Title
Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0017 /CH0456 (SB0857) Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Processing and Dispensing Medical Cannabis Delegate Glenn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
HB0027 Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Cigarette Devices - Prohibition Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0656 (SB0771) Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1052 /CH0012 (SB0703) Alcohol and Tobacco Commission Delegate Miller 4 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 12
Economic Matters
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1169 /CH0396 (SB0895) Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Economic Matters
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Finance
HB1174 Medical Cannabis - Pesticide Use - Labeling and Study Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1185 (SB0708) Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems - Prohibitions and Requirements Delegate Carey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1217 (SB0497) Pharmacists - Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use - Prescribing and Dispensing Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1307 Marijuana Laws - Full Disclosure of Legal, Employment, and Health Risks Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0378 Tobacco Products and Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems - Minimum Age and Civil Fines Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance and Judicial Proceedings
Finance
Judicial Proceedings
SB0708 (HB1185) Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems - Prohibitions and Requirements Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0749 Medical Cannabis - Pesticide Use - Labeling and Study Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0771 (HB0656) Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0895 (HB1169/CH0396) Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Finance
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM