Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Smoking and Vaping -see also- Cannabis; Cigarettes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0003 (SB0233)
Title
Business Regulation - Flavored Tobacco Products - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0400
Title
Tax - General - Vaping Product Tax
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0732
Title
Electronic Smoking Devices, Other Tobacco Products, and Cigarettes - Taxation and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1374
Title
Electronic Smoking Devices - Artificial or Natural Flavoring - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1400
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1604
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0003
Title
Electronic Smoking Devices, Other Tobacco Products, and Cigarettes - Taxation and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0054
Title
Electronic Smoking Devices - Added Flavoring - Prohibition on Shipping, Import, or Sale
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0233 (HB0003)
Title
Business Regulation - Flavored Tobacco Products - Prohibition
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0410
Title
Electronic Smoking Devices - Flavor Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0508
Title
St. Mary's County - Possession of Tobacco Product or Electronic Smoking Device by an Individual Under the Age of 21 Years - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0876
Title
Electronic Smoking Devices - Regulation and Taxation
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0937
Title
Baltimore City - Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Local Laws Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0003 (SB0233) Business Regulation - Flavored Tobacco Products - Prohibition Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0400 Tax - General - Vaping Product Tax Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
Economic Matters
HB0732 Electronic Smoking Devices, Other Tobacco Products, and Cigarettes - Taxation and Regulation Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1374 Electronic Smoking Devices - Artificial or Natural Flavoring - Prohibition Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1400 Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1604 Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - Penalty Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0003 Electronic Smoking Devices, Other Tobacco Products, and Cigarettes - Taxation and Regulation Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0054 Electronic Smoking Devices - Added Flavoring - Prohibition on Shipping, Import, or Sale Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0233 (HB0003) Business Regulation - Flavored Tobacco Products - Prohibition President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0410 Electronic Smoking Devices - Flavor Prohibition Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0508 St. Mary's County - Possession of Tobacco Product or Electronic Smoking Device by an Individual Under the Age of 21 Years - Prohibition Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0876 Electronic Smoking Devices - Regulation and Taxation Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0937 Baltimore City - Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Local Laws Authorization Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/27/2020 11:11 AM