Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Social Security

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0212
Title
Election Law - Statewide Voter Registration List - Removal of Deceased Voters
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0675
Title
Recreational Hunting or Fishing License Applications - Disclosure of Information
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0676
Title
Consumer Protection - Required Disclosure of Social Security Number - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0714 /CH0237 (SB0810)
Title
Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0769
Title
Recreational Hunting or Fishing License Applications - Disclosure of Information
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0932 /CH0431
Title
Charles County - Property Tax Credit - Senior Citizens Receiving Social Security Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Murphy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1174 /CH0448
Title
Recreational Hunting or Fishing Licenses - Denial, Suspension, and Required Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1270 (SB0914)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1364
Title
Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Exemptions - Employees Receiving Social Security Disability Insurance Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0015 /CH0467
Title
Election Law - Statewide Voter Registration List - Removal of Deceased Voters
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0810 (HB0714/CH0237)
Title
Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0914 (HB1270)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0212 Election Law - Statewide Voter Registration List - Removal of Deceased Voters Delegate Afzali 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0675 Recreational Hunting or Fishing License Applications - Disclosure of Information Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/12/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0676 Consumer Protection - Required Disclosure of Social Security Number - Prohibition Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0714 /CH0237 (SB0810) Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - Prohibitions Delegate Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Judiciary
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0769 Recreational Hunting or Fishing License Applications - Disclosure of Information Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0932 /CH0431 Charles County - Property Tax Credit - Senior Citizens Receiving Social Security Benefits Delegate Murphy 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Ways and Means
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1174 /CH0448 Recreational Hunting or Fishing Licenses - Denial, Suspension, and Required Disclosure Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Environmental Matters
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1270 (SB0914) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1364 Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Exemptions - Employees Receiving Social Security Disability Insurance Benefits Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0015 /CH0467 Election Law - Statewide Voter Registration List - Removal of Deceased Voters Senator Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 467
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0810 (HB0714/CH0237) Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - Prohibitions Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0914 (HB1270) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM