Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Social Security

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0149 (SB0170)
Title
Retirement Tax Fairness Act of 2019
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0226 (SB0550)
Title
Food Stamp Program - Minimum Benefit for Disabled Individuals - State Supplement
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0645
Title
Local Pension Systems - Special Disability Retirement Allowance
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0796 /CH0448 (SB0602)
Title
Public Health - Maternal Mortality Review Program - Establishment of Local Teams
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 (SB0871)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0170 (HB0149)
Title
Retirement Tax Fairness Act of 2019
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0550 (HB0226)
Title
Food Stamp Program - Minimum Benefit for Disabled Individuals - State Supplement
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0602 (HB0796/CH0448)
Title
Public Health - Maternal Mortality Review Program - Establishment of Local Teams
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1087)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0962
Title
Correctional Services - Offender Rehabilitation and Reentry Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0149 (SB0170) Retirement Tax Fairness Act of 2019 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0226 (SB0550) Food Stamp Program - Minimum Benefit for Disabled Individuals - State Supplement Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0645 Local Pension Systems - Special Disability Retirement Allowance Delegate Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2019 - 8:30 AM
HB0796 /CH0448 (SB0602) Public Health - Maternal Mortality Review Program - Establishment of Local Teams Delegate Wilkins 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1087 (SB0871) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0170 (HB0149) Retirement Tax Fairness Act of 2019 President 3 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0550 (HB0226) Food Stamp Program - Minimum Benefit for Disabled Individuals - State Supplement Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0602 (HB0796/CH0448) Public Health - Maternal Mortality Review Program - Establishment of Local Teams Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0871 (HB1087) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0962 Correctional Services - Offender Rehabilitation and Reentry Program - Establishment Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM