Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Social Security

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0342 (SB0278)
Title
Retirement Tax Reduction Act of 2020
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0647
Title
Child Support - Reporting of Employment Information
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1463
Title
Correctional Services - Inmates - Intake and Release Requirements (Reentry Success Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0077 /CH0514 (HB1553)
Title
Important Documents and Identification Cards – Inmates
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0278 (HB0342)
Title
Retirement Tax Reduction Act of 2020
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0342 (SB0278) Retirement Tax Reduction Act of 2020 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0647 Child Support - Reporting of Employment Information Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1463 Correctional Services - Inmates - Intake and Release Requirements (Reentry Success Act of 2020) Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0077 /CH0514 (HB1553) Important Documents and Identification Cards – Inmates Senator Ellis 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 514
Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2020 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0278 (HB0342) Retirement Tax Reduction Act of 2020 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 1:54 PM