Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Social Workers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0301 (SB0414)
Title
Public Safety - Segregated Confinement - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0547
Title
Medical Liability Efficiency Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0580 /CH0437 (SB0198)
Title
Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Recommended Courses
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0662 (SB0157/CH0327)
Title
Consultation, Diagnosis, and Treatment of Mental and Emotional Disorders - Consent by Minors
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0856 (SB0571)
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report - Penalties and Training
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0862 /CH0485 (SB0743/CH0484)
Title
Vital Records - New Certificates of Birth - Sex Change or Diagnosis of an Intersex Condition
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0908 (SB0617)
Title
Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0955
Title
Child Protection - Reporting Requirements - Threat of Harm
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1022 (SB0609)
Title
State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1116
Title
Public Schools - Student Suicide Intervention - Required Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1146 (SB0525)
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0157 /CH0327 (HB0662)
Title
Consultation, Diagnosis, and Treatment of Mental and Emotional Disorders - Consent by Minors
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0198 (HB0580/CH0437)
Title
Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Recommended Courses
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0414 (HB0301)
Title
Public Safety - Segregated Confinement - Report
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0525 (HB1146)
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0571 (HB0856)
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report - Penalties and Training
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0617 (HB0908)
Title
Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0743 /CH0484 (HB0862/CH0485)
Title
Vital Records - New Certificates of Birth - Sex Change or Diagnosis of an Intersex Condition
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0301 (SB0414) Public Safety - Segregated Confinement - Report Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0547 Medical Liability Efficiency Act of 2015 Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0580 /CH0437 (SB0198) Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Recommended Courses Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0662 (SB0157/CH0327) Consultation, Diagnosis, and Treatment of Mental and Emotional Disorders - Consent by Minors Delegate Cullison 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0856 (SB0571) Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report - Penalties and Training Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0862 /CH0485 (SB0743/CH0484) Vital Records - New Certificates of Birth - Sex Change or Diagnosis of an Intersex Condition Delegate Moon 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 485
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0908 (SB0617) Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law) Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0955 Child Protection - Reporting Requirements - Threat of Harm Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1022 (SB0609) State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Establishment Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1116 Public Schools - Student Suicide Intervention - Required Procedures Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1146 (SB0525) Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0157 /CH0327 (HB0662) Consultation, Diagnosis, and Treatment of Mental and Emotional Disorders - Consent by Minors Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 327
Finance
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0198 (HB0580/CH0437) Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Recommended Courses Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0414 (HB0301) Public Safety - Segregated Confinement - Report Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0525 (HB1146) Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0571 (HB0856) Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report - Penalties and Training Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0617 (HB0908) Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law) Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0743 /CH0484 (HB0862/CH0485) Vital Records - New Certificates of Birth - Sex Change or Diagnosis of an Intersex Condition Senator Lee 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 484
Finance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM