Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Social Workers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0107 /CH0251
Title
Higher Education - Walter Sondheim Jr. Public Service Internship Scholarship Program - Scholarship Amount
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0245 /CH0375 (SB0310/CH0374)
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0429 /CH0266
Title
Task Force to Combat Habitual Student Truancy
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0468 (SB0097/CH0348)
Title
Public Health - Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0579 (SB0858)
Title
Mental Health - Wraparound Services for Children and Youth
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0748
Title
Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Job Training Grant Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0885
Title
Behavioral Health Administration - Creation and Maintenance of Mental Health Professional Profiles (Patient Protection Provider Information Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Vogt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0908
Title
Hospitals - Substance Use Treatment Demonstration Program - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0944
Title
Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Vogt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1103
Title
Health Care Practitioners - Use of Teletherapy
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1438 /CH0219 (SB0532/CH0218)
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership - Correctional Case Management Specialist
Sponsor
Delegate Sophocleus
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0097 /CH0348 (HB0468)
Title
Public Health - Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach Programs
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0310 /CH0374 (HB0245/CH0375)
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0532 /CH0218 (HB1438/CH0219)
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership - Correctional Case Management Specialist
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0858 (HB0579)
Title
Mental Health - Wraparound Services for Children and Youth
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0107 /CH0251 Higher Education - Walter Sondheim Jr. Public Service Internship Scholarship Program - Scholarship Amount Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Ways and Means
2/04/2016 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0245 /CH0375 (SB0310/CH0374) Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 375
Judiciary
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0429 /CH0266 Task Force to Combat Habitual Student Truancy Delegate Patterson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
Ways and Means
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/09/2016 - 12:30 PM
HB0468 (SB0097/CH0348) Public Health - Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach Programs Delegate Lam 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0579 (SB0858) Mental Health - Wraparound Services for Children and Youth Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0748 Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Job Training Grant Program - Establishment Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0885 Behavioral Health Administration - Creation and Maintenance of Mental Health Professional Profiles (Patient Protection Provider Information Act) Delegate Vogt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0908 Hospitals - Substance Use Treatment Demonstration Program - Requirements Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0944 Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law) Delegate Vogt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1103 Health Care Practitioners - Use of Teletherapy Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1438 /CH0219 (SB0532/CH0218) Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership - Correctional Case Management Specialist Delegate Sophocleus 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219
Appropriations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0097 /CH0348 (HB0468) Public Health - Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach Programs Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 348
Finance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0310 /CH0374 (HB0245/CH0375) Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0532 /CH0218 (HB1438/CH0219) Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership - Correctional Case Management Specialist Senator McFadden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2016 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
SB0858 (HB0579) Mental Health - Wraparound Services for Children and Youth Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM