Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Social Workers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0326 (SB0288)
Title
Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Supervised Drug Consumption Facility Program
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0490 (SB0163/CH0441)
Title
Public Health - Community Health Workers - Advisory Committee and Certification
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0742 /CH0756 (SB0552/CH0757)
Title
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0827 (SB0669)
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion Program
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1289
Title
Correctional Services - Arrested Persons - Mental Disorder Screenings
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1299
Title
Nursing Facilities - Discharge Plans - Review and Signature Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1302 /CH0250
Title
Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective Orders
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1628
Title
Privileged Communications – Mental Health Providers – Exception for Suspected Child Abuse and Neglect
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0163 /CH0441 (HB0490)
Title
Public Health – Community Health Workers – Advisory Committee and Certification
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0288 (HB0326)
Title
Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Supervised Drug Consumption Facility Program
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0552 /CH0757 (HB0742/CH0756)
Title
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0669 (HB0827)
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion Program
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1263
Title
Public Safety – School Mental Health Services and Mental Disorder Weapon Restraining Order (School Safety Act of 2018: Anticipation)
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0326 (SB0288) Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Supervised Drug Consumption Facility Program Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0490 (SB0163/CH0441) Public Health - Community Health Workers - Advisory Committee and Certification Delegate Lam 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0742 /CH0756 (SB0552/CH0757) State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 756
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0827 (SB0669) Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion Program Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1289 Correctional Services - Arrested Persons - Mental Disorder Screenings Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1299 Nursing Facilities - Discharge Plans - Review and Signature Requirement Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1302 /CH0250 Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective Orders Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Judiciary
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 AM
HB1628 Privileged Communications – Mental Health Providers – Exception for Suspected Child Abuse and Neglect Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
SB0163 /CH0441 (HB0490) Public Health – Community Health Workers – Advisory Committee and Certification Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441
Finance
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0288 (HB0326) Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Supervised Drug Consumption Facility Program Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0552 /CH0757 (HB0742/CH0756) State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 757
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0669 (HB0827) Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion Program Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1263 Public Safety – School Mental Health Services and Mental Disorder Weapon Restraining Order (School Safety Act of 2018: Anticipation) Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:55 PM