Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Social Workers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0094
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Accidental Disability Retirement Application
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0571 /CH0410 (SB0522/CH0411)
Title
Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0592 /CH0545 (SB0669)
Title
Health Care Facilities - Comprehensive and Extended Care Facilities - Discharges and Transfers
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0761 (SB0600/CH0452)
Title
Health – Sickle Cell Disease – Steering Committee and Services
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0798
Title
Baltimore City - Truant Students - Active Intervention
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0829 /CH0551
Title
Health Insurance - Provider Panels - Graduate Providers
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0868 (SB0459)
Title
Medical Records – Compulsory Process Requests – Advisory Protocol and Voluntary Training Webinar
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1076
Title
Criminal Procedure - Out of Court Statements of Victims - Child Neglect and Abuse or Neglect of a Vulnerable Adult
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 (SB0871)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1198 /CH0373
Title
Human Trafficking – Required Posting
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1240 (SB0730)
Title
State Personnel – Merit Pay
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1252
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Training of Health Care Professionals
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1413 (SB1030/CH0771)
Title
The Blueprint for Maryland's Future
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0459 (HB0868)
Title
Medical Records – Compulsory Process Requests – Advisory Protocol and Voluntary Training Webinar
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0522 /CH0411 (HB0571/CH0410)
Title
Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0600 /CH0452 (HB0761)
Title
Health – Sickle Cell Disease – Steering Committee and Services
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0669 (HB0592/CH0545)
Title
Health Care Facilities - Comprehensive and Extended Care Facilities - Discharges and Transfers
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0730 (HB1240)
Title
State Personnel - Maryland Department of Health - Pay Rates
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1087)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1030 /CH0771 (HB1413)
Title
The Blueprint for Maryland’s Future
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0094 State Retirement and Pension System - Accidental Disability Retirement Application Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0571 /CH0410 (SB0522/CH0411) Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Revisions Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0592 /CH0545 (SB0669) Health Care Facilities - Comprehensive and Extended Care Facilities - Discharges and Transfers Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 545
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0761 (SB0600/CH0452) Health – Sickle Cell Disease – Steering Committee and Services Delegate Patterson 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0798 Baltimore City - Truant Students - Active Intervention Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0829 /CH0551 Health Insurance - Provider Panels - Graduate Providers Delegate Ghrist 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 551
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0868 (SB0459) Medical Records – Compulsory Process Requests – Advisory Protocol and Voluntary Training Webinar Delegate Barron 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1076 Criminal Procedure - Out of Court Statements of Victims - Child Neglect and Abuse or Neglect of a Vulnerable Adult Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1087 (SB0871) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Appropriations
3/01/2019 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules
HB1198 /CH0373 Human Trafficking – Required Posting Delegate Cox 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Judiciary
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB1240 (SB0730) State Personnel – Merit Pay Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1252 Child Abuse and Neglect - Training of Health Care Professionals Delegate McComas 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB1413 (SB1030/CH0771) The Blueprint for Maryland's Future Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Ways and Means
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0459 (HB0868) Medical Records – Compulsory Process Requests – Advisory Protocol and Voluntary Training Webinar Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0522 /CH0411 (HB0571/CH0410) Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Revisions Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Finance
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0600 /CH0452 (HB0761) Health – Sickle Cell Disease – Steering Committee and Services Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Rules
3/05/2019 - 11:30 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0669 (HB0592/CH0545) Health Care Facilities - Comprehensive and Extended Care Facilities - Discharges and Transfers President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0730 (HB1240) State Personnel - Maryland Department of Health - Pay Rates Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0871 (HB1087) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1030 /CH0771 (HB1413) The Blueprint for Maryland’s Future President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 771
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2019 - 4:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM