Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Social Workers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0515
Title
Public Schools - Staff Members - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Cain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0527 (SB0245/CH0543)
Title
Health Occupations - Social Workers - Scope of Practice, Supervision, and Application Decision Appeal Process
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0744
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1357
Title
Criminal Law - Felony Second-Degree Assault
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1387
Title
Certificates for Involuntary Admission - Licensed Certified Social Worker-Clinical
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1513 (SB0798)
Title
Education - Juvenile Services Education System - Establishment, Powers, and Duties
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1648 (SB1064)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0245 /CH0543 (HB0527)
Title
Health Occupations - Social Workers - Scope of Practice, Supervision, and Application Decision Appeal Process
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0798 (HB1513)
Title
Education - Juvenile Services Education System - Establishment, Powers, and Duties
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1064 (HB1648)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0515 Public Schools - Staff Members - Report Delegate Cain 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Ways and Means
2/14/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0527 (SB0245/CH0543) Health Occupations - Social Workers - Scope of Practice, Supervision, and Application Decision Appeal Process Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0744 Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1357 Criminal Law - Felony Second-Degree Assault Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1387 Certificates for Involuntary Admission - Licensed Certified Social Worker-Clinical Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1513 (SB0798) Education - Juvenile Services Education System - Establishment, Powers, and Duties Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1648 (SB1064) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0245 /CH0543 (HB0527) Health Occupations - Social Workers - Scope of Practice, Supervision, and Application Decision Appeal Process Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 543
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0798 (HB1513) Education - Juvenile Services Education System - Establishment, Powers, and Duties Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1064 (HB1648) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:22 PM