Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Soil Conservation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0797 /CH0631
Title
Nontidal Wetlands - Nontidal Wetland Mitigation Banking
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1110 (SB0645)
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Allocation of Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1428 (SB0748)
Title
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act - Application
Sponsor
Delegate Rose
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0645 (HB1110)
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Allocation of Funds
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0748 (HB1428)
Title
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act - Application
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0797 /CH0631 Nontidal Wetlands - Nontidal Wetland Mitigation Banking Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 631
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1110 (SB0645) Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Allocation of Funds Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1428 (SB0748) Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act - Application Delegate Rose 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0645 (HB1110) Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Allocation of Funds Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0748 (HB1428) Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act - Application Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM