Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Soil Conservation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0156 (SB0295)
Title
Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Sale of Harvested Cover Crops
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0395
Title
Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund - Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative - Use of Proceeds for Maryland Healthy Soils Program
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0877 (SB0582)
Title
Natural Resources - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Program and Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1176
Title
Agriculture - Maryland Healthy Soils Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1438
Title
Agriculture – Processing of Poultry Litter for Alternative Use
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0092 /CH0519
Title
Secretary of Agriculture - Weed Control Law
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0295 (HB0156)
Title
Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Sale of Harvested Cover Crops
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0156 (SB0295) Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Sale of Harvested Cover Crops Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0395 Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund - Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative - Use of Proceeds for Maryland Healthy Soils Program Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Economic Matters
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0877 (SB0582) Natural Resources - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Program and Fund Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1176 Agriculture - Maryland Healthy Soils Grant Program Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1438 Agriculture – Processing of Poultry Litter for Alternative Use Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0092 /CH0519 Secretary of Agriculture - Weed Control Law Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 519
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2020 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0295 (HB0156) Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Sale of Harvested Cover Crops Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:21 PM