Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Solicitation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0141
Title
Ethics Law - Soliciting the Employment of Lobbyist
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0228 /CH0159 (SB0274)
Title
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0467 /CH0118
Title
Allegany County - Roadside Solicitation of Money or Donations - Permit Duration
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0493 (SB0673)
Title
Referendum Integrity Act
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0560 /CH0005 (SB0538)
Title
Public-Private Partnerships
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0605
Title
Public-Private Partnerships
Sponsor
Delegate Clagett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0699 (SB0416)
Title
Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0854 /CH0643 (SB0479)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Not Criminally Responsible
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113
Title
Procurement - Disclosure Requirements and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Bohanan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0055 /CH0009
Title
Private Career Schools - Solicitor Permits - Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0274 (HB0228/CH0159)
Title
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0416 (HB0699)
Title
Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0479 (HB0854/CH0643)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Not Criminally Responsible
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0538 (HB0560/CH0005)
Title
Public-Private Partnerships
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0673 (HB0493)
Title
Referendum Integrity Act
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0789
Title
Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise Participation
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0141 Ethics Law - Soliciting the Employment of Lobbyist Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0228 /CH0159 (SB0274) Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0467 /CH0118 Allegany County - Roadside Solicitation of Money or Donations - Permit Duration Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Environmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0493 (SB0673) Referendum Integrity Act Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0560 /CH0005 (SB0538) Public-Private Partnerships Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 5
Environmental Matters
2/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0605 Public-Private Partnerships Delegate Clagett 2 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled (Environmental Matters)
Environmental Matters
Appropriations
HB0699 (SB0416) Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of Limitations Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0854 /CH0643 (SB0479) Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Not Criminally Responsible Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 643
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1113 Procurement - Disclosure Requirements and Penalties Delegate Bohanan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0055 /CH0009 Private Career Schools - Solicitor Permits - Repeal Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2013 - 3:00 PM
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0274 (HB0228/CH0159) Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0416 (HB0699) Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of Limitations Senator Forehand 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0479 (HB0854/CH0643) Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Not Criminally Responsible Senator Gladden 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0538 (HB0560/CH0005) Public-Private Partnerships President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0673 (HB0493) Referendum Integrity Act Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0789 Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise Participation Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM