Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Solicitation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0646
Title
Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0906
Title
Medical Laboratories - Direct-to-Consumer Genetic Testing
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1352 /CH0654 (SB0964)
Title
Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable Assets
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0098 /CH0025
Title
Health Insurance - Medicare Marketing Rules
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0227
Title
Health - Medical Laboratories - Advertising for or Soliciting Business - Repeal of Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0964 (HB1352/CH0654)
Title
Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable Assets
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0646 Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of Limitations Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0906 Medical Laboratories - Direct-to-Consumer Genetic Testing Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 PM
HB1352 /CH0654 (SB0964) Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable Assets Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0098 /CH0025 Health Insurance - Medicare Marketing Rules Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 25
Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0227 Health - Medical Laboratories - Advertising for or Soliciting Business - Repeal of Prohibition Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0964 (HB1352/CH0654) Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable Assets Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM