Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Solicitation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0150 /CH0073
Title
Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable Assets - Workgroup Reports - Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0158 /CH0403 (SB0243)
Title
State Personnel and Procurement - Service Contracts - Reporting and Audit Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0263 /CH0233
Title
Domestic Violence - Permanent Protective Orders - Conspiracy or Solicitation to Commit Murder
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1046
Title
Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1125 (SB0208)
Title
Family Law - Rehoming of Adopted Children
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1152
Title
Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit Program
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1163
Title
Consumer Protection - Maryland Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1254
Title
State Boat Act - Registered Vessel - Disclosure of Owner Information
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0137
Title
Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Crimes - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0208 (HB1125)
Title
Family Law - Rehoming of Adopted Children
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0243 (HB0158/CH0403)
Title
State Personnel and Procurement - Service Contracts - Reporting and Audit Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0150 /CH0073 Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable Assets - Workgroup Reports - Extension Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 73
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0158 /CH0403 (SB0243) State Personnel and Procurement - Service Contracts - Reporting and Audit Requirements Delegate Haynes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Appropriations
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0263 /CH0233 Domestic Violence - Permanent Protective Orders - Conspiracy or Solicitation to Commit Murder Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1046 Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of Limitations Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1125 (SB0208) Family Law - Rehoming of Adopted Children Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1152 Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit Program Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1163 Consumer Protection - Maryland Telephone Consumer Protection Act Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1254 State Boat Act - Registered Vessel - Disclosure of Owner Information Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0137 Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Crimes - Statute of Limitations Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0208 (HB1125) Family Law - Rehoming of Adopted Children Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0243 (HB0158/CH0403) State Personnel and Procurement - Service Contracts - Reporting and Audit Requirements Senator Feldman 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM