Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Solicitation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0283 /CH0341 (SB0109)
Title
Procurement - Prohibitions on Participation
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0299
Title
Campaign Finance - Political Action Committees - Solicitation Disclosures
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0303 (SB0854)
Title
Departmental Secretaries - Campaign and Working Hour Activities
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0426 /CH0589 (SB0311/CH0588)
Title
Promoting Efficiencies in State Procurement
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0451 /CH0186 (SB0375/CH0185)
Title
Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Continuing Education Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0653 /CH0647
Title
Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1317 /CH0812
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages Regulation Reform Act of 2017 PG 310-17
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1443 (SB0999)
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission Reform Act
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1452 (SB1043)
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard Requirements - Standard Offer Service
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1489
Title
Medical Laboratories - Advertising or Solicitation of Business - Repeal of Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0109 (HB0283/CH0341)
Title
Procurement - Prohibitions on Participation
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0271
Title
Criminal Law - Prostitution and Assignation - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0311 /CH0588 (HB0426/CH0589)
Title
Promoting Efficiencies in State Procurement
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0375 /CH0185 (HB0451/CH0186)
Title
Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Continuing Education Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0387 /CH0648
Title
Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0854 (HB0303)
Title
Departmental Secretaries - Campaign and Working Hour Activities
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0999 (HB1443)
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission Reform Act
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0283 /CH0341 (SB0109) Procurement - Prohibitions on Participation Delegate Krebs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Health and Government Operations
2/01/2017 - 3:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0299 Campaign Finance - Political Action Committees - Solicitation Disclosures Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0303 (SB0854) Departmental Secretaries - Campaign and Working Hour Activities Delegate Turner 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0426 /CH0589 (SB0311/CH0588) Promoting Efficiencies in State Procurement Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 589
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0451 /CH0186 (SB0375/CH0185) Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Continuing Education Requirements Delegate Cluster 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Economic Matters
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0653 /CH0647 Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of Limitations Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 647
Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1317 /CH0812 Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages Regulation Reform Act of 2017 PG 310-17 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 812
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1443 (SB0999) Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission Reform Act Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - House Concur - Senate Amendments
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1452 (SB1043) Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard Requirements - Standard Offer Service Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1489 Medical Laboratories - Advertising or Solicitation of Business - Repeal of Prohibition Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0109 (HB0283/CH0341) Procurement - Prohibitions on Participation Senator Conway 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0271 Criminal Law - Prostitution and Assignation - Penalties Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0311 /CH0588 (HB0426/CH0589) Promoting Efficiencies in State Procurement President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 588
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0375 /CH0185 (HB0451/CH0186) Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Continuing Education Requirements Senator Jennings 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Finance
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0387 /CH0648 Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of Limitations Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 648
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0854 (HB0303) Departmental Secretaries - Campaign and Working Hour Activities Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0999 (HB1443) Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission Reform Act Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM