Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Solicitation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0137 /CH0803
Title
Transportation - Aviation - Nonairport Taxicab Operators at BWI
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0383
Title
Campaign Finance Entities - Solicitation Disclosures - Expenditures
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0681
Title
Medical Laboratories - Advertising or Solicitation of Business - Repeal of Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0778
Title
Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder - Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1134 (SB0800)
Title
Criminal Law – Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practices – Sexual Activity With an Animal
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1783 /CH0014 (SB1243)
Title
21st Century School Facilities Act
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1805
Title
Election Law - Fund-Raising and Donations in Connection With a Campaign - Prohibition on Firearms
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0800 (HB1134)
Title
Criminal Law – Sexual Activity With an Animal, Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practices, and Sodomy
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1243 (HB1783/CH0014)
Title
21st Century School Facilities Act
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0137 /CH0803 Transportation - Aviation - Nonairport Taxicab Operators at BWI Delegate McConkey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 803
Economic Matters
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0383 Campaign Finance Entities - Solicitation Disclosures - Expenditures Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0681 Medical Laboratories - Advertising or Solicitation of Business - Repeal of Prohibition Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0778 Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder - Penalty Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1134 (SB0800) Criminal Law – Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practices – Sexual Activity With an Animal Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1783 /CH0014 (SB1243) 21st Century School Facilities Act Delegate Jones 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 14
Appropriations
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1805 Election Law - Fund-Raising and Donations in Connection With a Campaign - Prohibition on Firearms Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0800 (HB1134) Criminal Law – Sexual Activity With an Animal, Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practices, and Sodomy Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1243 (HB1783/CH0014) 21st Century School Facilities Act Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2018 - 1:45 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:55 PM