Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Somerset County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0459
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer and Wine Tasting License
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0465 (SB0424/CH0263)
Title
Somerset County - Emergency Burning Ban - Adoption and Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0466 (SB0155/CH0195)
Title
Somerset County - Sale of Small Boat Harbor Dock
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0470
Title
Somerset County - County Treasurer - Abolishment and Transfer of Functions to the County Supervisor of Tax Collection
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0119
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0491 /CH0120
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Selling Near Schools, Places of Worship, Public Libraries, and Youth Centers
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0492 /CH0473
Title
Employees' Pension System - Somerset County Economic Development Commission - Eligible Governmental Unit
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0154 /CH0194
Title
Somerset County - County Treasurer - Abolishment and Transfer of Functions to the County Supervisor of Tax Collection
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0155 /CH0195 (HB0466)
Title
Somerset County - Sale of Small Boat Harbor Dock
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0351 /CH0238
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer and Wine Tasting License
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0424 /CH0263 (HB0465)
Title
Somerset County - Emergency Burning Ban - Adoption and Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0470 /CH0472
Title
Employees' Pension System - Somerset County Economic Development Commission - Eligible Governmental Unit
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0471 /CH0277
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Selling Near Schools, Places of Worship, Public Libraries, and Youth Centers
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0789
Title
Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise Participation
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0459 Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer and Wine Tasting License Delegate Otto 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0465 (SB0424/CH0263) Somerset County - Emergency Burning Ban - Adoption and Enforcement Delegate Otto 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0466 (SB0155/CH0195) Somerset County - Sale of Small Boat Harbor Dock Delegate Otto 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0470 Somerset County - County Treasurer - Abolishment and Transfer of Functions to the County Supervisor of Tax Collection Delegate Otto 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0472 /CH0119 Local Government Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0491 /CH0120 Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Selling Near Schools, Places of Worship, Public Libraries, and Youth Centers Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0492 /CH0473 Employees' Pension System - Somerset County Economic Development Commission - Eligible Governmental Unit Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473
Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2013 - 8:30 AM
SB0154 /CH0194 Somerset County - County Treasurer - Abolishment and Transfer of Functions to the County Supervisor of Tax Collection Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0155 /CH0195 (HB0466) Somerset County - Sale of Small Boat Harbor Dock Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0351 /CH0238 Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer and Wine Tasting License Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0424 /CH0263 (HB0465) Somerset County - Emergency Burning Ban - Adoption and Enforcement Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0470 /CH0472 Employees' Pension System - Somerset County Economic Development Commission - Eligible Governmental Unit Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 472
Budget and Taxation
2/07/2013 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0471 /CH0277 Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Selling Near Schools, Places of Worship, Public Libraries, and Youth Centers Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0789 Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise Participation Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM