Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Somerset County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0204
Title
Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0439 /CH0734 (SB0246)
Title
Somerset County - State's Attorney - Annual Salary
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0762
Title
Income Tax - Earned Income Tax Credit - Eligibility Awareness Campaign Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0768 (SB0917/CH0353)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0802 (SB0863)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Somerset County - Teackle Mansion and the Sarah Martin Done House
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1111 (SB0953)
Title
Natural Resources - Eastern Shore - Deer Firearms Season
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1608 (SB1131)
Title
Somerset County - Community College - Eligibility of Students to Pay No Tuition or Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0039
Title
Somerset County - Code of Public Local Laws - Cross-References and Corrections
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0246 (HB0439/CH0734)
Title
Somerset County - State's Attorney - Annual Salary
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0863 (HB0802)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Somerset County - Teackle Mansion and the Sarah Martin Done House
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1131 (HB1608)
Title
Somerset County - Community College - Eligibility of Students to Pay No Tuition or Fees
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0204 Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - Funding Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0439 /CH0734 (SB0246) Somerset County - State's Attorney - Annual Salary Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 734
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0762 Income Tax - Earned Income Tax Credit - Eligibility Awareness Campaign Pilot Program Delegate Platt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0768 (SB0917/CH0353) Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit Delegate Otto 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0802 (SB0863) Creation of a State Debt - Somerset County - Teackle Mansion and the Sarah Martin Done House Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 AM
HB1111 (SB0953) Natural Resources - Eastern Shore - Deer Firearms Season Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1608 (SB1131) Somerset County - Community College - Eligibility of Students to Pay No Tuition or Fees Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0039 Somerset County - Code of Public Local Laws - Cross-References and Corrections Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/12/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0246 (HB0439/CH0734) Somerset County - State's Attorney - Annual Salary Senator Mathias 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0863 (HB0802) Creation of a State Debt - Somerset County - Teackle Mansion and the Sarah Martin Done House Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 AM
SB1131 (HB1608) Somerset County - Community College - Eligibility of Students to Pay No Tuition or Fees Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM