Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Somerset County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0329 (SB0007)
Title
Somerset County - Community College - Eligibility of Students to Pay No Tuition or Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0330 /CH0174 (SB0215/CH0175)
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Town of Vienna
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0425 /CH0327 (SB0356/CH0328)
Title
Somerset County - Fire Companies - Appropriations
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0433 /CH0085
Title
Somerset County - Annual Financial Report and Annual Audit Report - Filing Date
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0465 /CH0086
Title
Vehicle Laws - Golf Carts - City of Crisfield
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0486 (SB1172)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Somerset County - Teackle Mansion and the Sarah Martin Done House
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0631 /CH0540
Title
Somerset County - Fines and Forfeitures - Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0007 (HB0329)
Title
Somerset County - Community College - Eligibility of Students to Pay No Tuition or Fees
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0215 /CH0175 (HB0330/CH0174)
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Town of Vienna
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0352 /CH0084
Title
Somerset County - Annual Financial Report and Annual Audit Report - Filing Date
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0353 /CH0541
Title
Vehicle Laws - Golf Carts - City of Crisfield
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0356 /CH0328 (HB0425/CH0327)
Title
Somerset County - Fire Companies - Appropriations
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1172 (HB0486)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Somerset County - Teackle Mansion and the Sarah Martin Done House
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0329 (SB0007) Somerset County - Community College - Eligibility of Students to Pay No Tuition or Fees Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0330 /CH0174 (SB0215/CH0175) Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Town of Vienna Delegate Mautz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 174
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0425 /CH0327 (SB0356/CH0328) Somerset County - Fire Companies - Appropriations Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 327
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0433 /CH0085 Somerset County - Annual Financial Report and Annual Audit Report - Filing Date Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0465 /CH0086 Vehicle Laws - Golf Carts - City of Crisfield Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0486 (SB1172) Creation of a State Debt - Somerset County - Teackle Mansion and the Sarah Martin Done House Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 AM
HB0631 /CH0540 Somerset County - Fines and Forfeitures - Distribution Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 540
Judiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0007 (HB0329) Somerset County - Community College - Eligibility of Students to Pay No Tuition or Fees Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0215 /CH0175 (HB0330/CH0174) Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Town of Vienna Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0352 /CH0084 Somerset County - Annual Financial Report and Annual Audit Report - Filing Date Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 PM
SB0353 /CH0541 Vehicle Laws - Golf Carts - City of Crisfield Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 541
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0356 /CH0328 (HB0425/CH0327) Somerset County - Fire Companies - Appropriations Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 328
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1172 (HB0486) Creation of a State Debt - Somerset County - Teackle Mansion and the Sarah Martin Done House Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:55 PM