Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Sovereign Immunity

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0147 (SB0299/CH0482)
Title
Montgomery County - Maryland Tort Claims Act - Human Services Torts MC 13-14
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0183 (SB0558/CH0303)
Title
Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act - Industrial Development Authority
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0809
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act and Maryland Tort Claims Act - Damages Sustained on Artificial or Synthetic Turf Playing Fields
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1274
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0299 /CH0482 (HB0147)
Title
Montgomery County - Maryland Tort Claims Act - Human Services Torts
Sponsor
Montgomery County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0558 /CH0303 (HB0183)
Title
Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act - Industrial Development Authority
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0147 (SB0299/CH0482) Montgomery County - Maryland Tort Claims Act - Human Services Torts MC 13-14 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0183 (SB0558/CH0303) Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act - Industrial Development Authority Carroll County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0809 Local Government Tort Claims Act and Maryland Tort Claims Act - Damages Sustained on Artificial or Synthetic Turf Playing Fields Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1274 Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0299 /CH0482 (HB0147) Montgomery County - Maryland Tort Claims Act - Human Services Torts Montgomery County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0558 /CH0303 (HB0183) Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act - Industrial Development Authority Carroll County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM