Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Special Events

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0146 /CH0080 (SB0214/CH0081)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Weinberg Center License
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0297 /CH0156
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Catering Extension MC 27-20
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0558 (SB0126/CH0626)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Entertainment Facilities
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0642 (SB0361/CH0551)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777 /CH0322 (SB0792/CH0323)
Title
Kent County Alcohol Act of 2020
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0789 /CH0609
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wineries - Special Event Permits
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0844 /CH0338 (SB0503/CH0339)
Title
City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Club Public Event Permit
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1055 (SB0974)
Title
Public Ethics – Lobbyists – Gift Exception and Regulated Activities Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1148
Title
Vehicle Laws - Military Surplus Vehicles - Registration and Operation
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1319 /CH0459
Title
Wicomico County – Alcoholic Beverages – Board of License Commissioners
Sponsor
Delegate Anderton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1328
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1493 /CH0622 (SB0878/CH0623)
Title
Worcester County - Special Event Zones - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0126 /CH0626 (HB0558)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Entertainment Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0214 /CH0081 (HB0146/CH0080)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Weinberg Center License
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0361 /CH0551 (HB0642)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0378
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0503 /CH0339 (HB0844/CH0338)
Title
City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Club Public Event Permit
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0792 /CH0323 (HB0777/CH0322)
Title
Kent County Alcohol Act of 2020
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0839
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Permits and Brewery Limits
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0878 /CH0623 (HB1493/CH0622)
Title
Worcester County - Special Event Zones - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0146 /CH0080 (SB0214/CH0081) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Weinberg Center License Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 80
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0297 /CH0156 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Catering Extension MC 27-20 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 156
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0558 (SB0126/CH0626) Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Entertainment Facilities Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0642 (SB0361/CH0551) Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0777 /CH0322 (SB0792/CH0323) Kent County Alcohol Act of 2020 Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 322
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0789 /CH0609 Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wineries - Special Event Permits Washington County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 609
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0844 /CH0338 (SB0503/CH0339) City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Club Public Event Permit Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 338
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1055 (SB0974) Public Ethics – Lobbyists – Gift Exception and Regulated Activities Exemption Delegate Miller 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1148 Vehicle Laws - Military Surplus Vehicles - Registration and Operation Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1319 /CH0459 Wicomico County – Alcoholic Beverages – Board of License Commissioners Delegate Anderton 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 459
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1328 Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1493 /CH0622 (SB0878/CH0623) Worcester County - Special Event Zones - Prohibitions Delegate Hartman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 622
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0126 /CH0626 (HB0558) Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Entertainment Facilities Senator Reilly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 626
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0214 /CH0081 (HB0146/CH0080) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Weinberg Center License Senator Young 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 81
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0361 /CH0551 (HB0642) Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License Senator Beidle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 551
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0378 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License Harford County Senators 4 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0503 /CH0339 (HB0844/CH0338) City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Club Public Event Permit Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 339
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0792 /CH0323 (HB0777/CH0322) Kent County Alcohol Act of 2020 Senator Hershey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 323
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0839 Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Permits and Brewery Limits Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0878 /CH0623 (HB1493/CH0622) Worcester County - Special Event Zones - Prohibitions Senator Carozza 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 623
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2020 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/14/2020 12:35 PM