Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Special Education

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0079 (SB0135)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Youth in Transition School
Sponsor
Delegate Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102 /CH0425 (SB0127)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0661 (SB0995)
Title
Teaching Techniques - Students with Special Needs and Limited English Proficiency
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1161 /CH0671
Title
Commission on Special Education Access and Equity
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1286 (SB0691)
Title
Education - Due Process Hearings for Children with Disabilities - Burden of Proof
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1467 (SB0033)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Queen Anne's County - Wye River Upper School
Sponsor
Delegate Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0033 (HB1467)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Queen Anne's County - Wye River Upper School
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0127 (HB0102/CH0425)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0135 (HB0079)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Youth in Transition School
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0691 (HB1286)
Title
Education - Due Process Hearings for Children with Disabilities - Burden of Proof
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0995 (HB0661)
Title
Teaching Techniques - Students with Special Needs and Limited English Proficiency
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0079 (SB0135) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Youth in Transition School Delegate Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 11:00 AM
HB0102 /CH0425 (SB0127) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0661 (SB0995) Teaching Techniques - Students with Special Needs and Limited English Proficiency Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1161 /CH0671 Commission on Special Education Access and Equity Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 671
Ways and Means
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1286 (SB0691) Education - Due Process Hearings for Children with Disabilities - Burden of Proof Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1467 (SB0033) Creation of a State Debt - Queen Anne's County - Wye River Upper School Delegate Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 9:00 AM
SB0033 (HB1467) Creation of a State Debt - Queen Anne's County - Wye River Upper School Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 12:00 PM
SB0127 (HB0102/CH0425) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0135 (HB0079) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Youth in Transition School Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 9:00 AM
SB0691 (HB1286) Education - Due Process Hearings for Children with Disabilities - Burden of Proof Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0995 (HB0661) Teaching Techniques - Students with Special Needs and Limited English Proficiency Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM