Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Special Education

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0096 (SB0126)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - TLC's Katherine Thomas School
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0331 (SB0786/CH0611)
Title
Education - Behavior Intervention Plans - Physical Restraint and Seclusion
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1240 /CH0715
Title
Individualized Education Programs - Studies
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1310
Title
Education - Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0126 (HB0096)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - TLC's Katherine Thomas School
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0244
Title
Task Force to Study Suspension Rates of African American Prekindergarten Students
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0786 /CH0611 (HB0331)
Title
Education - Restraint and Seclusion - Consideration and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0825
Title
Education - Nonpublic Schools - Programs for Students With Special Needs
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0096 (SB0126) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - TLC's Katherine Thomas School Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 3:00 PM
HB0331 (SB0786/CH0611) Education - Behavior Intervention Plans - Physical Restraint and Seclusion Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1240 /CH0715 Individualized Education Programs - Studies Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 715
Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1310 Education - Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0126 (HB0096) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - TLC's Katherine Thomas School Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0244 Task Force to Study Suspension Rates of African American Prekindergarten Students Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/01/2017 - 2:00 PM
SB0786 /CH0611 (HB0331) Education - Restraint and Seclusion - Consideration and Reporting Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 611
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0825 Education - Nonpublic Schools - Programs for Students With Special Needs Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM