Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Special Education

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0140
Title
Special Education - Administrative Proceedings and Judicial Actions - Attorney's and Expert Witness Fees and Related Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0512
Title
Public School Construction - Maximum Gross Area Allowance for English Learner Students
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0611 /CH0547
Title
Special Education – Individualized Education Programs – Timeline for Independent Educational Evaluations
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0690 (SB0734/CH0512)
Title
Education - Students With Reading Difficulties - Screenings and Interventions
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0725 /CH0691 (SB0766)
Title
Public Schools - Student Discipline - Restorative Approaches
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1224
Title
County Boards of Education - Computer Science Courses
Sponsor
Delegate Rose
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1275
Title
Office of Administrative Hearings - Administrative Law Judges - Special Education Law Training
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0318 /CH0426
Title
Education - School Safety Subcabinet Advisory Board - Membership
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0734 /CH0512 (HB0690)
Title
Education - Students With Reading Difficulties - Screenings and Interventions
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0766 (HB0725/CH0691)
Title
Public Schools - Student Discipline - Restorative Approaches
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1016
Title
Education - Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0140 Special Education - Administrative Proceedings and Judicial Actions - Attorney's and Expert Witness Fees and Related Costs Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0512 Public School Construction - Maximum Gross Area Allowance for English Learner Students Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0611 /CH0547 Special Education – Individualized Education Programs – Timeline for Independent Educational Evaluations Delegate Guyton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 547
Ways and Means
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0690 (SB0734/CH0512) Education - Students With Reading Difficulties - Screenings and Interventions Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0725 /CH0691 (SB0766) Public Schools - Student Discipline - Restorative Approaches Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 691
Ways and Means
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1224 County Boards of Education - Computer Science Courses Delegate Rose 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1275 Office of Administrative Hearings - Administrative Law Judges - Special Education Law Training Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/01/2019 - 11:30 AM
SB0318 /CH0426 Education - School Safety Subcabinet Advisory Board - Membership Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0734 /CH0512 (HB0690) Education - Students With Reading Difficulties - Screenings and Interventions Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 512
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0766 (HB0725/CH0691) Public Schools - Student Discipline - Restorative Approaches Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1016 Education - Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM