Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Special Tax Districts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0119
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534 (SB0438)
Title
State Procurement - Contracting for Services Outside the United States
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0613 /CH0624
Title
Sustainable Communities - Designation and Financing
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1282
Title
Agricultural Land Condemnation Board
Sponsor
Delegate Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0362
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Motor Fuel - Local Transportation Tax
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0438 (HB0534)
Title
State Procurement - Contracting for Services Outside the United States
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0707
Title
Special Taxing Districts - Transportation Improvements and Exemption from County Tax Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0472 /CH0119 Local Government Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0534 (SB0438) State Procurement - Contracting for Services Outside the United States Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0613 /CH0624 Sustainable Communities - Designation and Financing Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 624
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
4/02/2013 - 1:30 PM
HB1282 Agricultural Land Condemnation Board Delegate Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0362 Sales and Use Tax - Motor Fuel - Local Transportation Tax Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0438 (HB0534) State Procurement - Contracting for Services Outside the United States Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0707 Special Taxing Districts - Transportation Improvements and Exemption from County Tax Limitations Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM