Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Special Tax Districts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0396 /CH0647
Title
Property Tax - Optional Installment Payment Schedule
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0997 /CH0709 (SB0259/CH0710)
Title
Cecil County – Special Taxing Districts – Internet Service
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0259 /CH0710 (HB0997/CH0709)
Title
Cecil County – Special Taxing Districts – Internet Service
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0396 /CH0647 Property Tax - Optional Installment Payment Schedule Delegate Carr 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 647
Ways and Means
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0997 /CH0709 (SB0259/CH0710) Cecil County – Special Taxing Districts – Internet Service Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 709
Ways and Means
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0259 /CH0710 (HB0997/CH0709) Cecil County – Special Taxing Districts – Internet Service Cecil County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 710
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2019 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM