Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Stadium Authority

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0525 (SB0516/CH0283)
Title
Economic Development - Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0860 /CH0647 (SB0743)
Title
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013
Sponsor
Baltimore City Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0516 /CH0283 (HB0525)
Title
Economic Development - Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0743 (HB0860/CH0647)
Title
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0525 (SB0516/CH0283) Economic Development - Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits Delegate Anderson 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0860 /CH0647 (SB0743) Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013 Baltimore City Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 647
Appropriations
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0516 /CH0283 (HB0525) Economic Development - Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits Senator Jones-Rodwell 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0743 (HB0860/CH0647) Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013 Senator Jones-Rodwell 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM
Click to return on the top page