Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Stadium Authority

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0965 /CH0727
Title
The Maryland International and Preakness Stakes Incentive Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1269 (SB0223)
Title
Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and Remedies
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1474 (SB1038)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Stadium Authority - Downtown Frederick Conference Center
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0692
Title
Baltimore City - Demolition Program Funding
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1038 (HB1474)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Stadium Authority - Downtown Frederick Conference Center
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0965 /CH0727 The Maryland International and Preakness Stakes Incentive Act of 2016 Delegate Walker 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 727
Ways and Means
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1269 (SB0223) Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and Remedies Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1474 (SB1038) Economic Development - Maryland Stadium Authority - Downtown Frederick Conference Center Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0692 Baltimore City - Demolition Program Funding Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB1038 (HB1474) Economic Development - Maryland Stadium Authority - Downtown Frederick Conference Center Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM