Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Stadium Authority

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0133
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - Renovation
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0311 (SB0400/CH0851)
Title
Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits and Capital Improvement Reserve Fund
Sponsor
Baltimore City Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1472
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Use of State Owned or Leased Suite - Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1548 /CH0639 (SB1084/CH0640)
Title
Baltimore City - Continuing the Creating Opportunities for Renewal and Enterprise (CORE) Partnership Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1783 /CH0014 (SB1243)
Title
21st Century School Facilities Act
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0040 /CH0150
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Exemption From Department of Information Technology Oversight
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0400 /CH0851 (HB0311)
Title
Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits and Capital Improvement Reserve Fund
Sponsor
Senator Conway
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0415
Title
Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs - Workgroup to Study Data Collection to Assist Small Businesses
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1084 /CH0640 (HB1548/CH0639)
Title
Baltimore City - Continuing the Creating Opportunities for Renewal and Enterprise (CORE) Partnership Fund
Sponsor
Senator Conway
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1243 (HB1783/CH0014)
Title
21st Century School Facilities Act
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0133 Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - Renovation Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0311 (SB0400/CH0851) Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits and Capital Improvement Reserve Fund Baltimore City Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1472 Maryland Stadium Authority - Use of State Owned or Leased Suite - Disclosure Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1548 /CH0639 (SB1084/CH0640) Baltimore City - Continuing the Creating Opportunities for Renewal and Enterprise (CORE) Partnership Fund Delegate Anderson 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 639
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1783 /CH0014 (SB1243) 21st Century School Facilities Act Delegate Jones 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 14
Appropriations
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0040 /CH0150 Maryland Stadium Authority - Exemption From Department of Information Technology Oversight Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 150
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/11/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0400 /CH0851 (HB0311) Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits and Capital Improvement Reserve Fund Senator Conway 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 851
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 PM
SB0415 Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs - Workgroup to Study Data Collection to Assist Small Businesses Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1084 /CH0640 (HB1548/CH0639) Baltimore City - Continuing the Creating Opportunities for Renewal and Enterprise (CORE) Partnership Fund Senator Conway 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 640
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1243 (HB1783/CH0014) 21st Century School Facilities Act Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2018 - 1:45 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:55 PM