Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Stadium Authority

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0001 /CH0020 (SB0001)
Title
Built to Learn Act of 2020
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0338 (SB0276)
Title
Building Opportunity Act of 2020
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0421 /CH0202 (SB0363/CH0203)
Title
State Government – Open Meetings – Requirements and Application of Open Meetings Act (Maryland State Agency Transparency Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0583 /CH0264 (SB0782)
Title
State Procurement - Payment of Employee Health Care Expenses - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1056
Title
Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1659 (SB1076)
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority – Youth and Amateur Sports Grants Program and Michael Erin Busch Sports Fund
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0001 (HB0001/CH0020)
Title
Built to Learn Act of 2020
Sponsor
Senator Peters
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0276 (HB0338)
Title
Building Opportunity Act of 2020
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0363 /CH0203 (HB0421/CH0202)
Title
State Government - Open Meetings - Requirements and Application of Open Meetings Act (Maryland State Agency Transparency Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0782 (HB0583/CH0264)
Title
State Procurement - Payment of Employee Health Care Expenses - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0987 /CH0590
Title
Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1076 (HB1659)
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Youth and Amateur Sports Grants Program and Fund
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0001 /CH0020 (SB0001) Built to Learn Act of 2020 Speaker 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20
Appropriations
1/23/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0338 (SB0276) Building Opportunity Act of 2020 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Appropriations
HB0421 /CH0202 (SB0363/CH0203) State Government – Open Meetings – Requirements and Application of Open Meetings Act (Maryland State Agency Transparency Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 202
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0583 /CH0264 (SB0782) State Procurement - Payment of Employee Health Care Expenses - Revisions Delegate Cullison 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 264
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1056 Racing and Community Development Act of 2020 Speaker 6 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-1)
Ways and Means
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB1659 (SB1076) Maryland Stadium Authority – Youth and Amateur Sports Grants Program and Michael Erin Busch Sports Fund Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Appropriations
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0001 (HB0001/CH0020) Built to Learn Act of 2020 Senator Peters 6 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
SB0276 (HB0338) Building Opportunity Act of 2020 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0363 /CH0203 (HB0421/CH0202) State Government - Open Meetings - Requirements and Application of Open Meetings Act (Maryland State Agency Transparency Act) Senator Kagan 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 203
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0782 (HB0583/CH0264) State Procurement - Payment of Employee Health Care Expenses - Revisions Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0987 /CH0590 Racing and Community Development Act of 2020 Senator Guzzone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 590
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2020 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
Appropriations
SB1076 (HB1659) Maryland Stadium Authority - Youth and Amateur Sports Grants Program and Fund Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/14/2020 12:40 PM