Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Stadiums

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0275 /CH0461 (SB0349/CH0460)
Title
Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0860 /CH0647 (SB0743)
Title
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013
Sponsor
Baltimore City Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1085 (SB0641)
Title
Statewide Container Recycling Incentive Program
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1262
Title
Public Health - Synthetic Infill Turf Fields - Informational Signs
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0307
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0349 /CH0460 (HB0275/CH0461)
Title
Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0641 (HB1085)
Title
Statewide Container Recycling Incentive Program
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0275 /CH0461 (SB0349/CH0460) Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013 Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0860 /CH0647 (SB0743) Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013 Baltimore City Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 647
Appropriations
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1085 (SB0641) Statewide Container Recycling Incentive Program Delegate McIntosh 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1262 Public Health - Synthetic Infill Turf Fields - Informational Signs Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0307 Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2013 Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0349 /CH0460 (HB0275/CH0461) Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013 Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 460
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0641 (HB1085) Statewide Container Recycling Incentive Program Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM