Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Stadiums

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0074 /CH0021 (SB0782/CH0087)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2014 - Baltimore County - Chesapeake High Stadium
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1040 (SB0977)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Towson High School Stadium
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1114 (SB0892)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1554
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium Beer, Wine, and Liquor License - Beer Vendors
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0782 /CH0087 (HB0074/CH0021)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2014 - Baltimore County - Chesapeake High Stadium
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0892 (HB1114)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0977 (HB1040)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Towson High School Stadium
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0074 /CH0021 (SB0782/CH0087) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2014 - Baltimore County - Chesapeake High Stadium Delegate Grammer 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21
Appropriations
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1040 (SB0977) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Towson High School Stadium Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 10:00 AM
HB1114 (SB0892) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1554 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium Beer, Wine, and Liquor License - Beer Vendors Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0782 /CH0087 (HB0074/CH0021) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2014 - Baltimore County - Chesapeake High Stadium Senator Salling 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 87
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0892 (HB1114) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0977 (HB1040) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Towson High School Stadium Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM