Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

State Aid

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0018
Title
Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0045
Title
State Education Aid - Real Property Valuation - Tax Increment Financing
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0090 /CH0093
Title
On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Operation and Maintenance Costs - Low-Income Homeowners
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0209 (SB1146)
Title
Education - State Grant to Counties With Declining Student Enrollment
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0285 /CH0258 (SB0455)
Title
State Education Aid - Real Property Valuation - Tax Increment Financing
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0420 /CH0522 (SB0417/CH0521)
Title
Individuals With Disabilities - Minimum Wage and Community Integration (Ken Capone Equal Employment Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0445 (SB0758/CH0696)
Title
Food Stamp Program - Minimum Benefit - State Supplement
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0449 (SB0375)
Title
Relief From Budget Mandates
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1018
Title
Prince George's County - Closures or Partial Closures of Hospitals - Board of Health Approval PG 406-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1388
Title
Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local Share
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1409 (SB0263)
Title
Payment in Lieu of Taxes - State Forest and State Park Land
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1433 (SB0461)
Title
Education - Prekindergarten Students - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1537 /CH0313
Title
Procurement - Priority of Purchasing Preferences - Individual With Disability Owned Business
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0263 (HB1409)
Title
Payment in Lieu of Taxes - State Forests, State Parks, and Wildlife Management Areas
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0375 (HB0449)
Title
Relief From Budget Mandates
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0413 (HB1499)
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Prevention Resolution Services - Funding and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0417 /CH0521 (HB0420/CH0522)
Title
Individuals With Disabilities - Minimum Wage and Community Integration (Ken Capone Equal Employment Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0455 (HB0285/CH0258)
Title
State Education Aid - Real Property Valuation - Tax Increment Financing
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0461 (HB1433)
Title
Education - Prekindergarten Students - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0758 /CH0696 (HB0445)
Title
Food Stamp Program - Minimum Benefit - State Supplement
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0948
Title
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1146 (HB0209)
Title
Education - State Grant to Counties With Declining Student Enrollment
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0018 Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2016 Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
1/26/2016 - 3:30 PM
HB0045 State Education Aid - Real Property Valuation - Tax Increment Financing Delegate McIntosh 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0090 /CH0093 On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Operation and Maintenance Costs - Low-Income Homeowners Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Environment and Transportation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0209 (SB1146) Education - State Grant to Counties With Declining Student Enrollment Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0285 /CH0258 (SB0455) State Education Aid - Real Property Valuation - Tax Increment Financing Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258
Appropriations
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0420 /CH0522 (SB0417/CH0521) Individuals With Disabilities - Minimum Wage and Community Integration (Ken Capone Equal Employment Act) Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 522
Economic Matters
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0445 (SB0758/CH0696) Food Stamp Program - Minimum Benefit - State Supplement Delegate Lierman 2 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Appropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0449 (SB0375) Relief From Budget Mandates Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1018 Prince George's County - Closures or Partial Closures of Hospitals - Board of Health Approval PG 406-16 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1388 Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local Share Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1409 (SB0263) Payment in Lieu of Taxes - State Forest and State Park Land Delegate Otto 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1433 (SB0461) Education - Prekindergarten Students - Funding Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1537 /CH0313 Procurement - Priority of Purchasing Preferences - Individual With Disability Owned Business Delegate Hixson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 313
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/09/2016 - 12:30 PM
SB0263 (HB1409) Payment in Lieu of Taxes - State Forests, State Parks, and Wildlife Management Areas Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0375 (HB0449) Relief From Budget Mandates President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0413 (HB1499) Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Prevention Resolution Services - Funding and Reporting Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Finance
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0417 /CH0521 (HB0420/CH0522) Individuals With Disabilities - Minimum Wage and Community Integration (Ken Capone Equal Employment Act) Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 521
Finance
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0455 (HB0285/CH0258) State Education Aid - Real Property Valuation - Tax Increment Financing Senator McFadden 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0461 (HB1433) Education - Prekindergarten Students - Funding Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0758 /CH0696 (HB0445) Food Stamp Program - Minimum Benefit - State Supplement Senator Madaleno 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 696
Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0948 Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB1146 (HB0209) Education - State Grant to Counties With Declining Student Enrollment Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM