Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

State Aid

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0552
Title
Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local Share
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0598
Title
Counties and Municipal Corporations - "Sanctuary Laws" for Illegal Aliens - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0696 (SB0849)
Title
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0931
Title
Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0984 (SB0475)
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Crisis Prevention Services - Funding and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1503
Title
Public Safety - Use of Force De-Escalation Training of Law Enforcement Officers - Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1638
Title
Employee Ownership Trusts
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0273 /CH0692
Title
State Forest, State Park, and Wildlife Management Area Revenue Equity Program
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0346
Title
Education - Prekindergarten Students - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0475 (HB0984)
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Crisis Prevention Services - Funding and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0712
Title
Historically Black Institutions - State Funding - Blount-Rawlings-Britt HBI Comparability Program
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0849 (HB0696)
Title
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0552 Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local Share Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0598 Counties and Municipal Corporations - "Sanctuary Laws" for Illegal Aliens - Prohibition Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0696 (SB0849) Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition Delegate McCray 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0931 Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2017 Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0984 (SB0475) Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Crisis Prevention Services - Funding and Reporting Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
Appropriations
HB1503 Public Safety - Use of Force De-Escalation Training of Law Enforcement Officers - Reports Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/02/2017 - 3:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1638 Employee Ownership Trusts Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0273 /CH0692 State Forest, State Park, and Wildlife Management Area Revenue Equity Program Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 692
Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0346 Education - Prekindergarten Students - Funding Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0475 (HB0984) Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Crisis Prevention Services - Funding and Reporting Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0712 Historically Black Institutions - State Funding - Blount-Rawlings-Britt HBI Comparability Program Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0849 (HB0696) Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM