Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

State Aid

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0557
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Education Trust Fund - Use of Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0941 /CH0396
Title
Child Care Subsidy Program – Unemployment – Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Services for Children With Prader-Willi Syndrome
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1203 (SB1141)
Title
Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2018
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1240
Title
Assisted Housing Preservation Act - Assisted Projects, Protected Actions, and Duties of the Department of Housing and Community Development
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1341 (SB0933/CH0419)
Title
College Affordability – Maryland 529 Plans and Student Loan Debt Relief Tax Credit – Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1361
Title
Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local Share
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1432
Title
Food Stamp Program - Summer Supplement for Children - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1476
Title
Education - Supplemental Prekindergarten Grant - Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1549
Title
Counties and Municipal Corporations - "Sanctuary Laws" for Illegal Aliens - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1565 (SB1060)
Title
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1606
Title
Higher Education - Workforce Shortage Vocational Certificate Grant Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1607 /CH0565
Title
Education - Juvenile Services Education Programs - Management and Operation
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1753 (SB0776)
Title
HBCU Internship in Maryland Government Scholarship Program
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0026
Title
State Agency Loan Program and Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program - Merger
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737
Title
State Finance and Procurement - State-Funded Entities - Diversity in Advertising
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0776 (HB1753)
Title
HBCU Internship in Maryland Government Scholarship Program
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0933 /CH0419 (HB1341)
Title
College Affordability – Maryland 529 Plans and Student Loan Debt Relief Tax Credit – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1003
Title
Magnetic Levitation Transportation System - Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1060 (HB1565)
Title
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1141 (HB1203)
Title
Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1210
Title
Criminal Procedure - Extradition - Duty of Local Governments (Sanctuary for Citizens Act)
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0557 Primary and Secondary Education - Education Trust Fund - Use of Fund Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0941 /CH0396 Child Care Subsidy Program – Unemployment – Eligibility Delegate Queen 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1113 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Services for Children With Prader-Willi Syndrome Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1203 (SB1141) Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2018 Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1240 Assisted Housing Preservation Act - Assisted Projects, Protected Actions, and Duties of the Department of Housing and Community Development Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1341 (SB0933/CH0419) College Affordability – Maryland 529 Plans and Student Loan Debt Relief Tax Credit – Revisions Delegate Jones 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1361 Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local Share Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1432 Food Stamp Program - Summer Supplement for Children - Pilot Program Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1476 Education - Supplemental Prekindergarten Grant - Eligibility Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1549 Counties and Municipal Corporations - "Sanctuary Laws" for Illegal Aliens - Prohibition Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1565 (SB1060) Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition Delegate McCray 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1606 Higher Education - Workforce Shortage Vocational Certificate Grant Program - Established Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1607 /CH0565 Education - Juvenile Services Education Programs - Management and Operation Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 565
Ways and Means
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1753 (SB0776) HBCU Internship in Maryland Government Scholarship Program Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0026 State Agency Loan Program and Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program - Merger Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Finance
1/11/2018 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0737 State Finance and Procurement - State-Funded Entities - Diversity in Advertising Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0776 (HB1753) HBCU Internship in Maryland Government Scholarship Program Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0933 /CH0419 (HB1341) College Affordability – Maryland 529 Plans and Student Loan Debt Relief Tax Credit – Revisions Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1003 Magnetic Levitation Transportation System - Limitations Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB1060 (HB1565) Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1141 (HB1203) Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2018 Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1210 Criminal Procedure - Extradition - Duty of Local Governments (Sanctuary for Citizens Act) Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:56 PM