Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

State Documents -see also- Maryland Register

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0045 (SB0069/CH0124)
Title
Maryland Register - Publication of Court Documents - Exception
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0046 (SB0275)
Title
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0193 (SB0027)
Title
Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Risk Assessment Tool or Index - Economic Impact Analysis
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0737
Title
State Government - Legislative and Regulatory Procedures - Efficacy Analyses
Sponsor
Delegate Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0790 (SB0595)
Title
Local Government - Restrictions on Income-Producing Real Property - Fiscal Impact Review
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1407
Title
Local Government - Restrictions on Income Producing Real Property - Fiscal Impact Study
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0027 (HB0193)
Title
Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Risk Assessment Tool or Index - Economic Impact Analysis
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0069 /CH0124 (HB0045)
Title
Maryland Register - Publication of Court Documents - Exception
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275 (HB0046)
Title
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0595 (HB0790)
Title
Local Government - Restrictions on Income-Producing Real Property - Fiscal Impact Review
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0045 (SB0069/CH0124) Maryland Register - Publication of Court Documents - Exception Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
HB0046 (SB0275) State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0193 (SB0027) Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Risk Assessment Tool or Index - Economic Impact Analysis Delegate Conway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0737 State Government - Legislative and Regulatory Procedures - Efficacy Analyses Delegate Ready 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0790 (SB0595) Local Government - Restrictions on Income-Producing Real Property - Fiscal Impact Review Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1407 Local Government - Restrictions on Income Producing Real Property - Fiscal Impact Study Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0027 (HB0193) Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Risk Assessment Tool or Index - Economic Impact Analysis Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:45 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2014 - 1:45 PM
SB0069 /CH0124 (HB0045) Maryland Register - Publication of Court Documents - Exception Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0275 (HB0046) State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0595 (HB0790) Local Government - Restrictions on Income-Producing Real Property - Fiscal Impact Review Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM