Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

State Documents -see also- Maryland Register

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162 (SB0611)
Title
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
Sponsor
Delegate Vitale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0678 (SB0478)
Title
General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Criminal Justice Policy Impact Statements
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0702 (SB0657)
Title
State Personnel - Programs to Improve Employee to Supervisor or Manager Ratios
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0752 (SB0738)
Title
Professional Engineers - Responsible Charge - Review and Approval of Engineering Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0989 (SB0713)
Title
State Government - Legislation Impacting Local Government Land Use Decisions - Economic Impact Analyses
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0478 (HB0678)
Title
General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Criminal Justice Policy Impact Statements
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0611 (HB0162)
Title
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0713 (HB0989)
Title
State Government - Legislation Impacting Local Government Land Use Decisions - Economic Impact Analyses
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0738 (HB0752)
Title
Professional Engineers - Responsible Charge - Review and Approval of Engineering Documents
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0162 (SB0611) State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act Delegate Vitale 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0678 (SB0478) General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Criminal Justice Policy Impact Statements Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0702 (SB0657) State Personnel - Programs to Improve Employee to Supervisor or Manager Ratios Delegate Jones 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0752 (SB0738) Professional Engineers - Responsible Charge - Review and Approval of Engineering Documents Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0989 (SB0713) State Government - Legislation Impacting Local Government Land Use Decisions - Economic Impact Analyses Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0478 (HB0678) General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Criminal Justice Policy Impact Statements Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 9:00 a.m.
Rules
3/05/2015 - 9:00 AM
SB0611 (HB0162) State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0713 (HB0989) State Government - Legislation Impacting Local Government Land Use Decisions - Economic Impact Analyses Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 9:00 a.m.
Rules
3/05/2015 - 9:00 AM
SB0738 (HB0752) Professional Engineers - Responsible Charge - Review and Approval of Engineering Documents Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM